NH HB1321 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the chartered public school joint legislative oversight committee.
Title
Relative to the chartered public school joint legislative oversight committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - OTPA (Y: 188 N: 137 NV: 19 Abs: 52) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0557h (NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 188-137 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 26 |
2020-03-12 | House | Amendment # 2020-0557h (NT): Amendment Adopted DV 190-132 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 26 |
2020-02-19 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-02-19 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0557h (NT) for 03/11/2020 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 47 |
2020-02-12 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/18/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2020-01-22 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/30/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2020-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 18 |