NH HB1318 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Hearing: 03/27/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 12
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Hearing: 03/27/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 12
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the duties of the opioid abatement advisory commission.
Title
Relative to the duties of the opioid abatement advisory commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Hearing: 03/27/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 12 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0424h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment # 2024-0424h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 |
2024-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0424h 02/21/2024 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 9 |
2024-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-01-05 | House | Executive Session: 01/10/2024 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2024 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 |