NH HB1318 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - House Signed by the Governor 07/13/2010; Effective 09/11/2010; Chapter 0299
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - House Signed by the Governor 07/13/2010; Effective 09/11/2010; Chapter 0299
Summary
Relative to post-conviction DNA testing, eligibility for victims compensation for a victim of a crime in which a petition for post-conviction DNA testing was filed, and victim services while the court is considering post-conviction DNA testing.
Title
Relative to post-conviction DNA testing, eligibility for victims compensation for a victim of a crime in which a petition for post-conviction DNA testing was filed, and victim services while the court is considering post-conviction DNA testing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-15 | House Signed by the Governor 07/13/2010; Effective 09/11/2010; Chapter 0299 | |
2010-06-02 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-06-02 | House Enrolled | |
2010-06-02 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #2340, New Title, Adopted | |
2010-06-02 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2340 (New Title) Adopted | |
2010-05-19 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1934s(NT) (Rep Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.2225 | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 18, Pg.497 | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1934s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 18, Pg.476 | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Committee Amendment 1934s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 18, Pg.476 | |
2010-05-06 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1934s, New Title, 5/12/10; Senate Calendar 19 | |
2010-04-19 | Senate Hearing: May 5, 2010, Room 103, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 11, Pg.262 | |
2010-03-03 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0731h (New Title): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1129-1130 | |
2010-03-03 | House Amendment #0731h (New Title) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1129-1130 | |
2010-02-16 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #0731h (New Title); House Calendar 17, PG.849-850 | |
2010-02-16 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0731h (NT) for Mar 3 Consent Calendar (Vote 15-1); House Calendar 17, PG.797 | |
2010-02-11 | House Continued Executive Session: 2/16/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2010-02-11 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/16/2010 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2010-02-03 | House Executive Session: 2/11/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 ==RECESSED== | |
2010-01-12 | House Public Hearing: 1/28/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 6, PG.236 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2154&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |