NH HB1313 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to prohibitions on carrying a loaded firearm on an OHRV or snowmobile.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to prohibitions on carrying a loaded firearm on an OHRV or snowmobile.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - House - Laid on Table (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - Refer to Interim Study (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-22 - House - OTP (Y: 181 N: 148 NV: 28 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 153 N: 175 NV: 29 Abs: 35) [FAIL]
2018-03-21 - House - Special Order (Y: 195 N: 137 NV: 28 Abs: 32) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenatePending Motion Ought to Pass; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-03SenateSen. Carson Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-03SenateSen. Sanborn Moved Ought to Pass; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-03SenateRefer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 12Y-12N, Motion Failed; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-02SenateCommittee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/03/2018;
2018-05-02SenateSpecial Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018
2018-05-02SenateSen. Daniels Moved to Remove HB 1313 from the Consent Calendar; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-04-24SenateCommittee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/02/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19
2018-04-10SenateHearing: 04/16/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 17
2018-03-28SenateIntroduced 03/22/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 11
2018-03-22HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 181-148 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 4
2018-03-22HouseMinority Amendment # 2018-0588h (Rep. Suzanne Smith): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 153-175 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 2
2018-03-21HouseSpecial Order to the first order of business on 3/22/2018 (Rep. Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 195-137 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 39
2018-03-16HouseSuspend House Rule 65; extending deadline for action to 3/22/2018 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 69
2018-03-08HouseSpecial Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49
2018-03-08HouseSuspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125
2018-02-21HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0588h
2018-02-21HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 11-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 75
2018-02-21HouseExecutive Session: 02/13/2018 Legislative Office Building 305
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/16/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2017-11-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 1 P. 6

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2363&sy=2018&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1313
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&id=1376&txtFormat=html
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=151&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB1313&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1313&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2363
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=159&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB1313&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1313&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2363
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=160&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB1313&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1313&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2363
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=230&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=HB1313&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1313&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2363
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=231&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=HB1313&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1313&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2363

Bill Comments

feedback