NH HB1311 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-17 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.965
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-17 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.965
Summary
Relative to the sunset date of legislative study committees.
Title
Relative to the sunset date of legislative study committees.
Sponsors
Rep. Laurie Boyce [R] | Rep. Nancy Elliott [R] | Rep. Edith Hogan [R] | Rep. Carl Seidel [R] |
Rep. Robert Willette [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-17 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.965 | |
2010-02-11 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 17 Consent Calendar (Vote 16-0); House Calendar 14, PG.593 | |
2010-02-02 | House Executive Session: 2/9/2010 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 104 | |
2010-01-19 | House Public Hearing: 1/25/2010 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Legislative Administration; House Journal 6, PG.235 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2129&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |