NH HB131 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 255; I. Sec. 2 Eff: 11/30/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 07/19/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 255; I. Sec. 2 Eff: 11/30/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 07/19/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission on mental health education and behavioral health and wellness programs.
Title
Establishing a commission on mental health education and behavioral health and wellness programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Cornell [D] | Rep. Mary Heath [D] | Rep. Joelle Martin [D] | Rep. Skip Berrien [D] |
Rep. Tamara Le [D] | Rep. Connie Van Houten [D] | Sen. Donovan Fenton [D] | Rep. Timothy Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-24 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 255; I. Sec. 2 Eff: 11/30/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 07/19/2019 |
2019-07-12 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 56 |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2019-2605c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/27/2019; Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | House | Conference Committee Report 2605c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 32 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2019-2605c; 06/27/2019 |
2019-06-19 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Myler Replaces Rep. Luneau 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 20 |
2019-06-14 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 06/19/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Kahn, Dietsch, Ward; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Kahn Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-11 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Luneau, Cornell, Doherty, Mullen 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 42 |
2019-06-11 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1961s/2169s/2223s and Requests CofC (Rep. Myler): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 42 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Special Order to to the present time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2019-1961s, 2019-2169s, and 2019-2223s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Ward Floor Amendment # 2019-2223s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Kahn Floor Amendment # 2019-2169s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1961s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1961s, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Hearing: 04/16/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 18 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0249h (NT): Motion Adopted DV 220-146 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 25 |
2019-02-14 | House | Amendment # 2019-0249h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 25 |
2019-02-07 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-02-06 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0249h (NT) for 02/14/2019 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 13 |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2019 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-12-26 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 38 |