NH HB1309 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 180-154 03/17/2022 House Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 180-154 03/17/2022 House Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study revising house rules to assure that all sections of the budget trailer bill receive an adequate public hearing.
Title
Establishing a committee to study revising house rules to assure that all sections of the budget trailer bill receive an adequate public hearing.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Wolf [R] | Rep. Brodie Deshaies [R] | Rep. James Allard [R] | Rep. Claire Rouillard [R] |
Rep. Karen Ebel [D] | Rep. Edward Gordon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 180-154 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 10-7; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-04 | House | Executive Session: 01/19/2022 01:40 pm Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2022-01-19 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2022 1:40 p.m. Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2021-11-20 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Legislative Administration |