NH HB1309 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-17 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.929
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-17 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.929
Summary
Requiring insurance coverage for infertility treatments.
Title
Requiring insurance coverage for infertility treatments.
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Perkins [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-17 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.929 | |
2010-02-05 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 17 Consent Calendar (Vote 17-0); House Calendar 14, PG.579 | |
2010-01-27 | House Executive Session: 2/4/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-01-22 | House Public Hearing: 2/2/2010 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 6, PG.235 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2225&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |