NH HB1307 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 195-138
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 195-138
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the state and political subdivisions from acquiring military-equipped vehicles or equipment which are not readily available in an open national commercial market.
Title
Prohibiting the state and political subdivisions from acquiring military-equipped vehicles or equipment which are not readily available in an open national commercial market.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - House - ITL (Y: 195 N: 138 NV: 29 Abs: 25) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 195-138 |
2014-03-07 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2014-0364h (New Title) |
2014-03-07 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0364h |
2014-03-07 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 19 |
2014-02-26 | House | Continued Executive Session: 3/4/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2014-02-18 | House | ===CONTINUED=== Executive Session: 2/20/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 ===RECESSED=== |
2014-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 2/18/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 ===RECESSED=== |
2014-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 1/30/2014 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration |