NH HB1305 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-13 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/26/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
Pending: House Resources, Recreation and Development Committee
Status: Introduced on December 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-13 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/26/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
Pending: House Resources, Recreation and Development Committee
Summary
Relative to designating uses for surface waters.
Title
Relative to designating uses for surface waters.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Abbott [D] | Rep. Jacalyn Cilley [D] | Rep. Marcia Moody [D] | Rep. Gary Richardson [D] |
Rep. Judith Spang [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-13 | House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/26/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2010-09-13 | House ==CANCELLED== Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/5/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2010-09-13 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/21/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2010-06-01 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/22/2010 1:30 PM DES Auditorium, 29 Hazen Dr, Concord | |
2010-06-01 | House Interim Study - Designated Uses Subcommittee Work Session: 6/14/2010 9:30 Amendment NH Fish & Game Conf Rm | |
2010-05-12 | House ==CANCELLED== Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/26/2010 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2010-04-21 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 4/27/2010 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2010-03-17 | House Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development for Interim Study; House Journal 26, PG.1365 | |
2010-02-17 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.976 | |
2010-02-08 | House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Feb 17 Consent Calendar (Vote 19-0); House Calendar 14, PG.597 | |
2010-02-08 | House Executive Session: 2/4/2010 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2010-01-20 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/27/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2010-01-20 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 1/28/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2010-01-13 | House Public Hearing: 1/20/2010 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 6, PG.235 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2096&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |