NH HB1304 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-16 - House Signed by the Governor 06/14/2010; Effective 06/14/2010; Chapter 0141
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-16 - House Signed by the Governor 06/14/2010; Effective 06/14/2010; Chapter 0141
Summary
Extending legislative study committees and commissions.
Title
Extending legislative study committees and commissions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-16 | House Signed by the Governor 06/14/2010; Effective 06/14/2010; Chapter 0141 | |
2010-05-19 | House Enrolled; House Journal 46, PG.2244 | |
2010-05-19 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-05-13 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2039 Adopted; House Journal 42, PG.2153 | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #2039 Adopted | |
2010-05-05 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1371s (NT) (Rep L.Weber): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.1882 | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1371s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Committee Amendment 1371s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1371s, New Title, 4/28/10 | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Without Objection, Chair moved to Special Order to 04/28/10; Senate Journal 15, Pg.303 | |
2010-04-15 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1371s, New Title, 4/21/10; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2010-04-08 | Senate Hearing: April 13, 2010, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 11, Pg.261 | |
2010-03-10 | House Ought to Pass with Amendments #0653h (NT) and #860h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 23, PG.1273-1274 | |
2010-03-10 | House Floor Amendment #0860h (Rep L.Weber) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 23, PG.1274 | |
2010-03-10 | House Amendment #0653h (New Title) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 23, PG.1273-1274 | |
2010-03-03 | House Special Ordered to Next Session Without Objection; House Journal 20, PG.1180 | |
2010-03-03 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep L.Weber); House Journal 20 PG.1095 | |
2010-02-12 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #0653h (New Title); House Calendar 17, PG.849 | |
2010-02-12 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0653h (NT) for Mar 3 Consent Calendar (Vote 16-0); House Calendar 17, PG.807 | |
2010-02-02 | House Executive Session: 2/9/2010 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 104 | |
2010-01-19 | House Public Hearing: 1/25/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Legislative Administration; House Journal 6, PG.235 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2095&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |