NH HB1303 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1523s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/18/2024; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1523s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/18/2024; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the estate of Tekeste Berhanu.
Title
Relative to the estate of Tekeste Berhanu.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1523s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/18/2024; Senate Journal 10 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-1523s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/18/2024; Senate Journal 10 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1523s, 04/18/2024, Vote 7-0; Senate Calendar 15A |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Hearing: 04/02/2024, Room 103, State House, 02:20 pm; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-21 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 |
2024-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/06/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-02-28 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/06/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/06/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-02-28 | House | Public Hearing: 03/05/2024 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Ways and Means 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 |
2024-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0548h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 |
2024-02-22 | House | Amendment # 2024-0548h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 |
2024-02-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0548h 02/07/2024 (Vote 19-1; Regular Calendar) |
2024-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2024 08:30 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-01-26 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/07/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-01-05 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/10/2024 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 |