NH HB1302 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2024; Chapter 22; eff:07/19/2024 House Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2024; Chapter 22; eff:07/19/2024 House Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to elected conservation commissions in towns.
Title
Relative to elected conservation commissions in towns.
Sponsors
Rep. John Sellers [R] | Rep. Diane Pauer [R] | Rep. Jim Creighton [R] | Rep. Robert Wherry [R] |
Rep. Walter Spilsbury [R] | Rep. Lisa Post [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-21 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2024; Chapter 22; eff:07/19/2024 House Journal 13 |
2024-05-09 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 94 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/02/2024); Senate Journal 12 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/18/2024; Senate Journal 10 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/18/2024, Vote 3-1; Senate Calendar 15A |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Hearing: 04/02/2024, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:50 am; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2024 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0505h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 20 |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment # 2024-0505h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 20 |
2024-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0505h 02/21/2024 (Vote 16-3; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 13 |
2024-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2024-01-24 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2024 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 15 |