NH HB1302 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the weighing of vehicles.
Title
Relative to the weighing of vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 04/21/2022; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Hearing: 04/12/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced 03/31/2022 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 8 |
2022-03-31 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 199-151 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-03-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2022 10:10 am Legislative Office Building201-203 |
2021-11-19 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Transportation |