NH HB1302 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - House II. Remainder Effective 07/01/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - House II. Remainder Effective 07/01/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to underpayment of estimated taxes and equalization of valuations administered by the department of revenue administration.
Title
Relative to underpayment of estimated taxes and equalization of valuations administered by the department of revenue administration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | House II. Remainder Effective 07/01/2012 | |
2012-04-24 | House I. Section 1 Effective 12/31/2012 | |
2012-04-24 | House Signed By Governor 04/23/2012; Chapter 0014 | |
2012-04-18 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 11, Pg.384 | |
2012-04-11 | House Enrolled | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8, Pg.328 | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/28/12; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2012-03-14 | Senate Hearing: 3/20/12, Room 100, State House, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2012-02-08 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Ways & Means; Senate Journal 5, Pg.122 | |
2012-02-08 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0449h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 15, PG.891 | |
2012-02-08 | House Amendment #0449h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 15, PG.891 | |
2012-02-08 | House Special Order to Next Order of Business: Without Objection; House Journal 15, PG.890 | |
2012-01-31 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2012-0449h; House Calendar 6, PG.337 | |
2012-01-31 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0449h for Feb 8 (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 6, PG.297 | |
2012-01-03 | House Executive Session: 1/31/2012 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2012-01-03 | House Public Hearing: 1/17/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-11-18 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 7, PG.350 |