NH HB130 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB130
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-06 - ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-06 - ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the drug affordability board.
Title
Repealing the drug affordability board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-06 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36 |
2023-08-30 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/06/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-03-15 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/15/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-03-08 | House | Executive Session: 03/15/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-02-23 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/08/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/02/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-01-25 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2023 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2023-01-24 | House | Vacated and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs (Rep. Osborne): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/24/2023 House Journal 3 P. 25 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |
Same As/Similar To
HB130 (Carry Over) 2023-09-06 - ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36