NH HB1295 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1323-1324
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1323-1324
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the potential effects of total deregulation of the telecommunications industry.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the potential effects of total deregulation of the telecommunications industry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1323-1324 | |
2012-02-22 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 7 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1076 | |
2012-02-09 | House Continued Executive Session: 2/15/2012 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2012-01-31 | House Executive Session: 2/7/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 =RECESSED= | |
2012-01-05 | House Public Hearing: 1/19/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2011-11-18 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 7, PG.350 |