NH HB1294 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the commission on demographic trends to consider data on race and ethnicity for the purpose of increasing racial and ethnic diversity in New Hampshire.
Title
Requiring the commission on demographic trends to consider data on race and ethnicity for the purpose of increasing racial and ethnic diversity in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-02 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 01/24/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2022-01-24 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2022 2:15 p.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-11-19 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |