NH HB1291 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/10/2016 House Journal 16 P. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/10/2016 House Journal 16 P. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminating the land use board, establishing an advisory board, and requiring approval of federal land acquisitions by the governor, executive council, and general court.
Title
Eliminating the land use board, establishing an advisory board, and requiring approval of federal land acquisitions by the governor, executive council, and general court.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Eastman [R] | Rep. Joseph Hannon [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Rep. Frank Edelblut [R] |
Rep. James McConnell [R] | Rep. Leon Rideout [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/10/2016 House Journal 16 P. 7 |
2016-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/10/2016 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 6 |
2016-01-20 | House | Executive Session: 01/28/2016 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building305 |
2016-01-21 | House | Work Session: 01/26/2016 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2016-01-06 | House | Public Hearing: 01/14/2016 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building305 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 4 P. 9 |