NH HB1273 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Subcommittee Work Session: 01/20/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building302-304
Pending: House Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the use of free and open source software.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the use of free and open source software.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-18HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/20/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building302-304
2022-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/11/2022 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304
2021-11-19HouseIntroduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback