NH HB1270 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/14/2024; Chapter 72; eff. 8/13/2024 House Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to protective custody statutes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to protective custody statutes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-20HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/14/2024; Chapter 72; eff. 8/13/2024 House Journal 16
2024-06-10HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 05/30/2024 House Journal 15 P. 36
2024-06-10SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/30/2024); Senate Journal 17
2024-04-26SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2024; Senate Journal 11
2024-04-25SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17
2024-03-27SenateHearing: 04/02/2024, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 13
2024-03-26SenateIntroduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 8
2024-03-14HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2024-0851h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2024 House Journal 8 P. 4
2024-03-14HouseAmendment # 2024-0851h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2024 House Journal 8 P. 4
2024-02-29HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0851h 02/23/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
2024-02-14HouseExecutive Session: 02/23/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204
2024-02-14HousePublic Hearing: 02/21/2024 12:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204
2024-01-09House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/26/2024 12:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204
2023-12-06HouseIntroduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 14

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback