NH HB1265 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - House Signed by the Governor 05/26/2010; Effective 01/01/2011; Chapter 0100
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - House Signed by the Governor 05/26/2010; Effective 01/01/2011; Chapter 0100
Summary
Requiring school boards to develop a policy to address air quality issues in schools.
Title
Requiring school boards to develop a policy to address air quality issues in schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Catriona Beck [D] | Rep. Judith Day [D] | Sen. Molly Kelly [D] | Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] |
Sen. Margaret Wood Hassan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | House Signed by the Governor 05/26/2010; Effective 01/01/2011; Chapter 0100 | |
2010-04-21 | House Enrolled; House Journal 35, PG.1671 | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 14, Pg.295 | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 14, Pg.287 | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass 4/14/10; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2010-03-31 | Senate Hearing: April 6, 2010, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 11, Pg.261 | |
2010-01-27 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0195h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 12, PG.499 | |
2010-01-27 | House Amendment #0195h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 12, PG.499 | |
2010-01-21 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #0195h; House Calendar 8, PG.359 | |
2010-01-21 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0195h for Jan 27 Consent Calendar (vote 18-1); House Calendar 8, PG.331 | |
2010-01-15 | House Executive Session: 1/20/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2010-01-14 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/19/2010 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2010-01-05 | House Public Hearing: 1/12/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2009-12-10 | House To Be Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Education; House Journal 6, PG.234 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2414&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |