NH HB1264 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/13/2018; Chapter 370; Eff. 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to construction of the terms "resident," "inhabitant," "residence," and "residency."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to construction of the terms "resident," "inhabitant," "residence," and "residency."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - House - Concur (Y: 182 N: 156 NV: 23 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - Laid on Table (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - House - OTP (Y: 171 N: 144 NV: 47 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Table (Y: 148 N: 167 NV: 47 Abs: 29) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-17HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/13/2018; Chapter 370; Eff. 07/01/2019
2018-05-16HouseEnrolled 05/10/2018
2018-05-16SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-10HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1890s (Rep. B. Griffin): Motion Adopted DV 182-156 05/10/2018
2018-05-02SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1890s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-05-02SenateSen. Feltes Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Motion Failed; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-05-02SenateSen. Birdsell Floor Amendment # 2018-1890s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-04-24SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19
2018-03-29SenateHearing: 04/10/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 15
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Election Law and Internal Affairs; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-06HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 171-144 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 134
2018-03-06HouseLay HB 1264 on Table (Rep. Dyer): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 148-167 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 132
2018-03-01HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2018-03-01HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 51
2018-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 02/13/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/25/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2017-11-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Election Law House Journal 1 P. 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2352&sy=2018&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1264
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&id=1365&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1365
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=96&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB1264&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1264&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2352
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=97&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB1264&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1264&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2352
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=204&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=HB1264&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1264&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2352
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=205&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=HB1264&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1264&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2352
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=228&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB1264&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1264&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2352

Bill Comments

feedback