NH HB1254 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the housing appeals board.
Title
Relative to the housing appeals board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-3; Regular Calendar) |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive Session: 02/03/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/12/2022 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-11-19 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Judiciary |