NH HB1254 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - Enrolled 05/23/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study the procedures for adoption of national codes by the state of New Hampshire; establishing a moratorium on the adoption of changes to the state building code and state fire code; and repealing the joint legislative oversight committee on the emergency management system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study the procedures for adoption of national codes by the state of New Hampshire; establishing a moratorium on the adoption of changes to the state building code and state fire code; and repealing the joint legislative oversight committee on the emergency management system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - House - Adopt CofC (Y: 173 N: 155 NV: 38 Abs: 25) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-05HouseEnrolled 05/23/2018
2018-06-04SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-23HouseConference Committee Report 2009c: Adopted, Regular Calendar 173-155 05/23/2018
2018-05-23HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Roberts) 05/23/2018
2018-05-23SenateConference Committee Report # 2018-2009c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18
2018-05-17SenateConference Committee Report Filed, # 2018-2009c; 05/17/2018
2018-05-15HouseConferee Change: Rep. Chandler Replaces Rep. Roberts 05/10/2018
2018-05-11HouseConference Committee Meeting: 05/15/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2018-05-10SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Carson, Gannon, Soucy; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17
2018-05-10SenateSen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17
2018-05-10HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Beaudoin, Roberts, Kaczynski, McGuire 05/10/2018
2018-05-10HouseHouse Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1776s and 1887s and Requests CofC (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018
2018-05-02SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2018-1776s and 2018-1887s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-05-02SenateSen. Giuda Floor Amendment # 2018-1887s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-05-02SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1776s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-05-02SenateWithout Objection, Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment # 2018-1776s; 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-05-02SenateChair Ruled Sections of Amendment # 2018-1776s Non-Germane, 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-04-25SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1776s, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19
2018-04-12SenateHearing: 04/18/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 17
2018-03-13SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-06HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 33
2018-02-23HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 18
2018-02-23HouseExecutive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 306
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/11/2018 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 306
2017-11-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback