NH HB1251 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 184-131 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to participation in school sports programs for female student-athletes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to participation in school sports programs for female student-athletes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - ITL (Y: 184 N: 131 NV: 28 Abs: 53) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 184-131 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 14
2020-03-03HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2020-03-03HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 13-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 46
2020-02-18HouseExecutive Session: 02/26/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2020-01-28House==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 02/04/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207
2020-01-08House==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/14/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 15

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback