NH HB1248 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-15 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-15 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the acceptance of risk in outdoor recreational activities.
Title
Relative to the acceptance of risk in outdoor recreational activities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 13 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 5/15/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Hearing: 4/22/14, Room 100, State House, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 13 |
2014-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 2/18/2014 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2014-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 2/4/2014 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-12-13 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development |