NH HB124 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-30 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-30 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to temporary alimony.
Title
Relative to temporary alimony.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra DeSimone [R] | Rep. Alicia Lekas [R] | Rep. John Potucek [R] | Rep. Walter Stapleton [R] |
Rep. James Spillane [R] | Rep. Tina Harley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/30/2023; Senate Calendar 15 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Hearing: 03/21/2023, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced 02/22/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 179-178 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 64 |
2023-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 02/07/2023 (Vote 8-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 17 |
2023-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Children and Family Law |