NH HB1239 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 2 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-02 - Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 21, Pg.777
Status: Enrolled on June 2 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-02 - Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 21, Pg.777
Summary
Relative to processing certain environmental permits and administrative fines for violations of dredge and fill requirements, relative to air quality in public schools, and drinking water revolving loan funds.
Title
Relative to processing certain environmental permits and administrative fines for violations of dredge and fill requirements, relative to air quality in public schools, and drinking water revolving loan funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-02 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 21, Pg.777 | |
2010-06-02 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.2327 | |
2010-06-02 | House Conference Committee Report #2153 Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.2311 | |
2010-06-02 | Senate Conference Committee Report 2153; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 21, Pg.670 | |
2010-05-27 | Senate Conference Committee Report 2153; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed | |
2010-05-21 | House Conference Committee Meeting: 5/24/2010 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2010-05-19 | Senate President Appoints: Senators Fuller Clark, Merrill and Odell; Senate Journal 20, Pg.656 | |
2010-05-19 | Senate Sen. Fuller Clark accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 20, Pg.656 | |
2010-05-19 | House Speaker Appoints: Reps Spang, McClammer, Rous & C.Christensen; House Journal 46, PG.2195 | |
2010-05-19 | House House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment and Req Comm of Conf (Reps Spang & Almy): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.2195 | |
2010-05-13 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 19, Pg.633 | |
2010-05-13 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 2071s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 19, Pg.517 | |
2010-05-13 | Senate Sen. Fuller Clark Floor Amendment 2071s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.517 | |
2010-05-13 | Senate Committee Amendment 1958s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.512 | |
2010-05-13 | Senate Sen. Fuller Clark Moved Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.507 | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Sen. Fuller Clark Moved Laid On Table Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 18, Pg.451 | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Committee Amendment 1958s Not Voted On | |
2010-05-06 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1958s, 5/12/10; Senate Calendar 19 | |
2010-04-09 | Senate Hearing: April 22, 2010, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Energy, Environment and Economic Development; Senate Journal 11, Pg.261 | |
2010-03-24 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0996h: Motion Adopted Division Vote 206-108; House Journal 30, PG.1487-1488 | |
2010-03-24 | House Amendment #0996h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 30, PG.1487-1488 | |
2010-03-18 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 22, PG.1227 | |
2010-03-18 | House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #0996h; House Calendar 22, PG.1238 | |
2010-03-18 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0996h for Mar 24 (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.1227 | |
2010-03-10 | House Executive Session: 3/16/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 (Continued 3/17/10 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 If Necessary) | |
2010-03-04 | House Full Committee Work Session: 3/8/2010 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2010-03-03 | House Referred to Ways and Means | |
2010-03-03 | House Suspend Rules, Allow Sec Comm Ref (Reps Almy & Major): Motion Adopted Division Vote 301-24 by Req 2/3; House Journal 20 PG.1094 | |
2010-03-03 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0261h (New Title): Motion Adopted Division Vote 186-124; House Journal 20, PG.1093-1094 | |
2010-03-03 | House Amendment #0261h (New Title) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1093-1094 | |
2010-02-17 | House Special Ordered to Next Session Day Beginning of Calendar: Motion Adopted Without Objection; House Journal 18, PG.1015 | |
2010-02-17 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Groen); House Journal 18, PG.927 | |
2010-02-10 | House Special Ordered to Regular Place in Feb 17 Consent Calendar: Motion Adopted Without Objection; House Journal 16, PG.783 | |
2010-02-10 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Vaillancourt); House Journal 16, PG.748 | |
2010-02-03 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #0261h (New Title); House Calendar 13, PG.561-562 | |
2010-02-03 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0261h (New Title) for Feb 10 Consent Calendar (vote 16-1); House Calendar 13, PG.532 | |
2010-01-27 | House Executive Session: 2/2/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2010-01-20 | House Public Hearing: 1/26/2010 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 6, PG.233 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2505&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |