NH HB1238 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 170; Eff. 1/1/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 170; Eff. 1/1/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to animal cruelty involving an equine colt.
Title
Relative to animal cruelty involving an equine colt.
Sponsors
Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. Edith DesMarais [D] | Rep. Virginia Irwin [D] | Rep. Bill Nelson [R] |
Rep. Linda Massimilla [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 170; Eff. 1/1/2019 |
2018-05-23 | House | Enrolled 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1937e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1937e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/03/2018; |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Special Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Moved to Remove HB 1238 from the Consent Calendar; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Hearing: 04/10/2018, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0691h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 32 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0691h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 32 |
2018-02-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0691h (NT) for 03/06/2018 (Vote 11-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 18 |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 303 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 1 P. 4 |