NH HB1238 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - Signed by the Governor on 7/14/2014; Chapter 0219; Effective Date 9/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - Signed by the Governor on 7/14/2014; Chapter 0219; Effective Date 9/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to access to assessment materials.
Title
Relative to access to assessment materials.
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Harris [R] | Rep. David Murotake [R] | Rep. Ralph Boehm [R] |
Rep. J.R. Hoell [R] | Rep. Richard Marston [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-18 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/14/2014; Chapter 0219; Effective Date 9/12/2014. |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 5/15/2014) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/8/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Hearing: 4/22/14, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health, Education and Human Services |
2014-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0735h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-12 | House | Adopt Amendment #2014-0735h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0735h (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 14 |
2014-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 3/4/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2014-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/4/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2014-02-13 | House | Public Hearing: 2/18/2014 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2014-02-04 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/13/2014 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 207 ===RECESSED=== |
2014-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/6/2014 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-12-13 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Education |