NH HB1238 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-15 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/13/2010 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
Pending: House Education Committee
Status: Introduced on December 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-15 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/13/2010 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
Pending: House Education Committee
Summary
Relative to student membership on the university system of New Hampshire board of trustees.
Title
Relative to student membership on the university system of New Hampshire board of trustees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-15 | House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/13/2010 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2010-03-17 | House Referred to Education for Interim Study; House Journal 26, PG.1365 | |
2010-01-27 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 12, PG.499 | |
2010-01-21 | House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 27 Consent Calendar (vote 18-1); House Calendar 8, PG.331 | |
2010-01-05 | House Executive Session: 1/20/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2010-01-05 | House Public Hearing: 1/12/2010 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Education; House Journal 6, PG.233 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2476&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |