NH HB1228 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the payment of an amount paid to redeem real property and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Requiring the payment of an amount paid to redeem real property and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 29 |
2016-02-17 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 24-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 19 |
2016-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/04/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2016-01-26 | House | Public Hearing: 01/12/2016 03:15 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Finance House Journal 4 P. 6 |