NH HB1224 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-16 - House II. Remainder Effective 08/13/2010
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-16 - House II. Remainder Effective 08/13/2010
Summary
Relative to school employee and volunteer background investigations and relative to applicants for driver education certificates and school licenses.
Title
Relative to school employee and volunteer background investigations and relative to applicants for driver education certificates and school licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-16 | House II. Remainder Effective 08/13/2010 | |
2010-06-16 | House I. Section 2 Effective as Provided in Section 3 | |
2010-06-16 | House Signed by the Governor 06/14/2010; Chapter 0138 | |
2010-05-19 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-05-19 | House Enrolled; House Journal 46, PG.2247 | |
2010-05-19 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2079 Adopted; House Journal 46, PG.2238 | |
2010-05-13 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #2079 Adopted | |
2010-05-05 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1360s (Rep Rous): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.1882 | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 15, Pg.325 | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1360s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Committee Amendment 1360s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15, Pg.314 | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1360s, 4/21/10; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2010-03-29 | Senate Hearing: March 30, 2010, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 13 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 11, Pg.261 | |
2010-03-24 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1090h: Motion Adopted Division Vote 234-116; House Journal 30, PG.1516-1517 | |
2010-03-24 | House Floor Amendment #1090h (Rep Rous) Adopted, Division Vote 225-128; House Journal 30, PG.1516-1517 | |
2010-03-24 | House Remove from the Table (Rep Rous): Motion Adopted Division Vote 219-140; House Journal 30, PG.1516 | |
2010-03-03 | House Lay on the Table (Rep Eaton): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1088 | |
2010-03-03 | House Amendment #0419h Failed, Regular Calendar 129-205; House Journal 20, PG.1085-1088 | |
2010-02-17 | House Special Ordered to Next Session Day Beginning of Calendar: Motion Adopted Without Objection; House Journal 18, PG.1015 | |
2010-02-17 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Webb); House Journal 18, PG.927 | |
2010-02-10 | House Special Ordered to Regular Place in Feb 17 Consent Calendar: Motion Adopted Without Objection; House Journal 16, PG.783 | |
2010-02-10 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Vaillancourt); House Journal 16, PG.748 | |
2010-02-02 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #0419h; House Calendar 13, PG.560-561 | |
2010-02-02 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0419h for Feb 10 Consent Calendar (vote 20-0); House Calendar 13, PG.524 | |
2010-01-27 | House Executive Session: 2/2/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2010-01-19 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/28/2010 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2010-01-05 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 1/20/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2010-01-05 | House Public Hearing: 1/12/2010 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Education; House Journal 6, PG.232 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2186&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |