NH HB1221 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/17/2022; Chapter 189; I. Sec 1 eff. 06/17/2022 II. Rem eff. 07/01/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/17/2022; Chapter 189; I. Sec 1 eff. 06/17/2022 II. Rem eff. 07/01/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the rate of the business profits tax, and relative to payment by the state to political subdivisions of an amount equal to a portion of retirement system contributions of political subdivision employers.
Title
Relative to the rate of the business profits tax, and relative to payment by the state to political subdivisions of an amount equal to a portion of retirement system contributions of political subdivision employers.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeanine Notter [R] | Rep. Leonard Turcotte [R] | Rep. Jason Osborne [R] | Rep. Max Abramson [R] |
Rep. Maureen Mooney [R] | Rep. Deborah Hobson [R] | Rep. John Potucek [R] | Rep. Bob Healey [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-26 - Senate - Conference Committee Report (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Sections (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Sections (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Committee Amendment Sections (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Committee Amendment Sections (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - OTPA (Y: 177 N: 141 NV: 40 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 227 N: 99 NV: 32 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Sections (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Sections (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Committee Amendment Sections (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Committee Amendment Sections (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - OTPA (Y: 177 N: 141 NV: 40 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 227 N: 99 NV: 32 Abs: 32) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/17/2022; Chapter 189; I. Sec 1 eff. 06/17/2022 II. Rem eff. 07/01/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-07 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-26 | House | Conference Committee Report 2022-2050c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2022-2050c; Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Adopted; 05/26/2022; Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2022-2050c; 05/26/2022 Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Conferee Change; Senator Daniels Replaces Senator D'Allesandro; Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-18 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/18/2022 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Giuda, Bradley, D'Allesandro; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2022-1840s 2022-1528s and Requests CofC (Reps. Abrami, Bershtein, Janigian, Lang): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/05/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1840s: Remainder of the bill with the effective date, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1840s: Sections 1, 3, and 7, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Sen. Soucy Moved to divide the Question on the motion of Ought to Pass with Amendment: Sections 1, 3, and 7 and then the remainder of the bill as amended with the effective date; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | The Chair ruled the Question Divisible; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1840s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1840s, 05/05/2022; Senate Calendar 18 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Chair Ruled Sections of Amendment # 2022-1528s Non-Germane, 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1528s: Remainder of the bill with the effective date , Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1528s: Sections 1, 3, and 7, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | The Chair ruled the Question Divisible; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Sen. Soucy Moved to divide the Question on the motion of Ought to Pass with Amendment: Sections 1, 3, and 7 and then the remainder of the bill as amended with the effective date; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2022-1528s: Remainder of Amendment with the effective date, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2022-1528s: Sections 3 and 7, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | The Chair ruled the Question Divisible; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Sen. Soucy Moved to divide the Question on Committee Amendment #2022-1528s: Sections 3 and 7 and then the remainder of the amendment with the effective date; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Without Objection, Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment # 2022-1528s; 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1528s, 04/21/2022; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Hearing: 04/06/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am, on proposed amendment # 2022-1294s; Senate Calendar 14 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Hearing: 03/30/2022, Room 100, State House, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 13 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-18 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0471: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 177-141 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-18 | House | Amendment # 2022-0471h (NT): Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 227-99 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-18 | House | Special Order HB1221 (Rep. Osborne): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-10 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-03-10 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0471h (Vote 12-11; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-02 | House | Executive Session: 03/09/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-02-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/24/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-02-03 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/10/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-01-26 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/02/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-01-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/26/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/13/2022 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-11-18 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Ways and Means |