NH HB1217 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amending the certification requirements for school nurses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the certification requirements for school nurses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-12 - House - Ought to Pass (Y: 8 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12
2018-04-12SenateSen. Reagan Moved Inexpedient to Legislate; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12
2018-04-12SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 8Y-14N, Motion Failed; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12
2018-04-03SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/12/2018; Senate Calendar 16
2018-03-15SenateHearing: 03/20/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 13
2018-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 7
2018-02-22HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 233-107 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 30
2018-02-14HouseMinority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study
2018-02-14HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/22/2018 (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 16
2018-02-14HouseExecutive Session: 02/13/2018 Legislative Office Building 207
2018-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2017-11-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 3

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback