NH HB1215 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 168; Eff. 8/7/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to voting on variances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to voting on variances.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-11HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 168; Eff. 8/7/2018
2018-05-09HouseEnrolled 05/03/2018
2018-05-09SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/03/2018); Senate Journal 17
2018-04-26HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1352s (Rep. J. Belanger): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 House Journal 14 P. 2
2018-04-12SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1352s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12
2018-04-12SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1352s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12
2018-04-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1352s, 04/12/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16
2018-03-20SenateHearing: 04/04/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 14
2018-03-13SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-06HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0738h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 49
2018-03-06HouseAmendment # 2018-0738h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 49
2018-02-28HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0738h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 28
2018-01-11HouseExecutive Session: 02/21/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 02/14/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301
2017-11-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 3

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback