NH HB1214 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Senate Inadvertently introduced into the Senate, without objection returned to House per Senate Rule 3-3; Senate Journal 10, Pg.378
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Senate Inadvertently introduced into the Senate, without objection returned to House per Senate Rule 3-3; Senate Journal 10, Pg.378
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Banning corn-based ethanol as an additive to gasoline sold in New Hampshire.
Title
Banning corn-based ethanol as an additive to gasoline sold in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Rep. Lyle Bulis [R] | Rep. David Campbell [D] | Rep. Edmond Gionet [R] | Rep. Jonathan Maltz [R] |
Rep. Beatriz Pastor-Bodmer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Senate Inadvertently introduced into the Senate, without objection returned to House per Senate Rule 3-3; Senate Journal 10, Pg.378 | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Without Objection HB 1214 is vacated from Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 9, Pg.349 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 7, Pg.185 | |
2012-03-07 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1264 | |
2012-03-07 | House Special Order to Next Order of Business: Without Objection; House Journal 21, PG.1264 | |
2012-02-22 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 18, PG.1108 | |
2012-02-22 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 7 (Vote 7-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1108 | |
2012-02-09 | House Continued Executive Session: 2/15/2012 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2012-01-31 | House Executive Session: 2/7/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 =RECESSED= | |
2012-01-05 | House Public Hearing: 1/19/2012 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2011-11-16 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 7, PG.347 |