NH HB1212 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 131
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 131
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the effect of homicide on distribution at death.
Title
Relative to the effect of homicide on distribution at death.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 131 |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 61 |
2020-01-28 | House | Executive Session: 02/18/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2020 10:40 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 13 |