NH HB1210 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Lay HB1210 on Table (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted DV 308-28 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 120
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Lay HB1210 on Table (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted DV 308-28 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 120
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the election of Strafford county commissioners.
Title
Relative to the election of Strafford county commissioners.
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Horrigan [D] | Rep. Chuck Grassie [D] | Rep. Cam Kenney [D] | Rep. Heath Howard [D] |
Rep. Allan Howland [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - House - Indefinitely Postpone (Y: 168 N: 169 NV: 31 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2024-03-21 - House - Table (Y: 167 N: 170 NV: 31 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2024-03-21 - House - OTP (Y: 168 N: 168 NV: 32 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2024-03-21 - House - Indefinitely Postpone (Y: 168 N: 169 NV: 31 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2024-03-21 - House - Table (Y: 167 N: 170 NV: 31 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2024-03-21 - House - Table (Y: 167 N: 170 NV: 31 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2024-03-21 - House - OTP (Y: 168 N: 168 NV: 32 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2024-03-21 - House - Indefinitely Postpone (Y: 168 N: 169 NV: 31 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2024-03-21 - House - Table (Y: 167 N: 170 NV: 31 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Lay HB1210 on Table (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted DV 308-28 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 120 |
2024-03-21 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 168-168 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 118 |
2024-03-21 | House | Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. L. Turcotte): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 168-169 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 114 |
2024-03-21 | House | Lay HB1210 on Table (Rep. Weber): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 167-170 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 114 |
2024-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 03/11/2024 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar) |
2024-03-06 | House | Executive Session: 03/11/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Municipal and County Government |