NH HB121 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB121
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-15 - Retained in Committee
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-15 - Retained in Committee
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to worldwide combined reporting for unitary businesses under the business profits tax.
Title
Relative to worldwide combined reporting for unitary businesses under the business profits tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 01/31/2023 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB121 (Carry Over) 2023-02-15 - Retained in Committee