NH HB1205 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 22-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 22-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the reduction in the calculation of state retirement system annuities at age 65.
Title
Relative to the reduction in the calculation of state retirement system annuities at age 65.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 22-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 4 |
2020-04-23 | House | Executive Session: 04/30/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link: https://zoom.us/j/95408968840 |
2020-03-04 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/18/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2020-02-26 | House | Division I Work Session: 03/03/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Finance 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 49 |
2020-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 181-151 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 49 |
2020-02-12 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-02-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/19/2020 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 19 |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2020 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 13 |