NH HB1204 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Hearing: 05/07/2024, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 18
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 1:30 pm in Room 100, State House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Hearing: 05/07/2024, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 18
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 1:30 pm in Room 100, State House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to government agent entries into secured premises.
Title
Relative to government agent entries into secured premises.
Sponsors
Rep. James Spillane [R] | Rep. Cyril Aures [R] | Rep. Jeanine Notter [R] | Rep. Judy Aron [R] |
Rep. Jonathan Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - House - OTPA (Y: 228 N: 139 NV: 16 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Hearing: 05/07/2024, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 18 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0839h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 228-139 03/14/2024 House Journal 8 |
2024-03-14 | House | Amendment # 2024-0839h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2024 House Journal 8 |
2024-02-29 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2024-02-29 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0839h 02/23/2024 (Vote 15-5; Regular Calendar) |
2024-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/23/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-02-14 | House | Public Hearing: 02/21/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-01-09 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/26/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |