NH HB1203 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-13 - House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. B. Griffin): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-13 - House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. B. Griffin): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to voter registration and verification of voter identity.
Title
Relative to voter registration and verification of voter identity.
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Horrigan [D] | Rep. Paul Berch [D] | Rep. Bruce Cohen [D] | Rep. Sherry Frost [D] |
Rep. Cam Kenney [D] | Rep. Ellen Read [D] | Rep. Judith Spang [D] | Rep. Janet Wall [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - Senate - Divide the Question (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Committee Amendment Sections (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Committee Amendment Sections (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. B. Griffin): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1660s: Remainder of the bill with the effective date, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1660s: Sections 1 and 7, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | The Chair ruled the Question Divisible; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sen. Soucy Moved to divide the Question on the motion of Ought to Pass with Amendment: Sections 1 and 7 and then the remainder of the bill as amended with the effective date; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2022-1660s: Remainder of Amendment with the effective date, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2022-1660s: Sections 1 and 7, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | The Chair ruled the Question Divisible; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sen. Soucy Moved to divide the Question on Committee Amendment #2022-1660s: Sections 1 and 7 and then the remainder of the amendment with the effective date; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1660s, 04/28/2022; Senate Calendar 17 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Hearing: 04/04/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-17 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0962h: Motion Adopted DV 185-163 03/16/2022 House Journal 7 |
2022-03-17 | House | Amendment # 2022-0962h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/16/2022 House Journal 7 |
2022-03-09 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-03-09 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0962h (NT) (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-09 | House | Executive Session: 03/09/2022 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2022-02-10 | House | Public Hearing: 02/10/2022 11:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2021-11-18 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Election Law |