NH HB1203 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expanding the definition of a neglected child to include cases involving sibling violence.
Title
Expanding the definition of a neglected child to include cases involving sibling violence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 2 |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 3 |
2020-02-19 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206 |
2020-02-12 | House | Public Hearing: 02/18/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206 (exec. session may follow public hearing schedule) |
2020-01-29 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/04/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 1 P. 13 |