NH HB1201 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the accountability of public officials.
Title
Relative to the accountability of public officials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-03 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 5 (Vote 17-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 7 |
2014-01-21 | House | Executive Session: 1/28/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-12-13 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Judiciary |