NH HB1200 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2024 House Journal 8 P. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2024 House Journal 8 P. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to controlled and secured storage of printed paper ballots.
Title
Relative to controlled and secured storage of printed paper ballots.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Wherry [R] | Rep. Claudine Burnham [R] | Rep. Cyril Aures [R] | Rep. Kristine Perez [R] |
Rep. Sandra Panek [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2024 House Journal 8 P. 6 |
2024-03-06 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/05/2024 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar) |
2024-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 03/05/2024 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-02-14 | House | Public Hearing: 02/20/2024 09:50 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Election Law |