NH HB120 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2322h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2322h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to hours of sales by off-premises liquor licensees.
Title
Relative to hours of sales by off-premises liquor licensees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-25 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2322h |
2013-11-25 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) |
2013-10-04 | House | ==Rescheduled== Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/22/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-09-10 | House | ==Cancelled==Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/29/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-09-10 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/24/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-02-05 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 2/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-01-23 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 1/31/2013 11:10 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 1/23/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.183 |