NH HB1194 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-09 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2024; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-09 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2024; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of noncommunicable disease.
Title
Relative to the definition of noncommunicable disease.
Sponsors
Rep. Emily Phillips [R] | Rep. Tom Mannion [R] | Rep. Kelley Potenza [R] | Rep. Leah Cushman [R] |
Rep. Erica Layon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2024; Senate Journal 12 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/16/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Hearing: 04/17/2024, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-07 | House | Reconsider HB1194 (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Failed DV 171-192 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 51 |
2024-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0809h: Motion Adopted DV 191-171 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 51 |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment # 2024-0809h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 51 |
2024-02-27 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2024-02-27 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0809h 02/21/2024 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 21 |
2024-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-01-17 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |