NH HB1192 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/16/2024; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/16/2024; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to contempt actions in domestic relations matters.
Title
Relative to contempt actions in domestic relations matters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/16/2024; Senate Journal 13 |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Special Order to 05/16/2024, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/15/2024 Senate Journal 12 |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/16/2024, Vote 5-0; Senate Calendar 19 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Hearing: 04/02/2024, Room 100, State House, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-21 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0914h: Motion Adopted DV 187-178 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 21 |
2024-03-21 | House | Amendment # 2024-0914h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 21 |
2024-03-11 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0914h 03/05/2024 (Vote 9-5; Regular Calendar) |
2024-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 03/05/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/20/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Children and Family Law |